Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00072
Date Filed2019-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS a New Mexico non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Marcos-Gallup Resource Management Plan and proposed amendment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR a department of the United States Executive Branch
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT an agency of the United States Executive Branch
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5884974) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons BLM Summons, # 3 Summons DOI summons, # 4 Summons US Atty summons, # 5 Summons AG summons)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-112MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma A. O. Bruden, :Firm- Kampmeier & Knutsen,, :Address- P.O. Box 15099 Portland, Oregon 97293. Phone No. - (503) 719-5641. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5885034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-113LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Bahr, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-16Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-164SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emma A. O. Bruden. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-055NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar