Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOrganization of Professional Aviculturists, Inc. v. Everson et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2019cv20195
Date Filed2019-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge James Lawrence King
PlaintiffOrganization of Professional Aviculturists, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Organization of Professional Agriculturalists submitted six FOIA requests to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the agency's regulations implementing the Wild Bird Conservation Act and its implementation. OPA submitted an additional three FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, OPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantActing Director Margaret Everson in her official capacity as Principal Deputy Director Exercising the Authority of the Director of U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
DefendantU.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-141COMPLAINT under the Freedom of Information Act against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11311518, filed by Organization of Professional Aviculturists, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-142Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-153Summons Issued as to Margaret Everson, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jao) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-154Corporate Disclosure Statement by Organization of Professional Aviculturists, Inc. (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-155CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Organization of Professional Aviculturists, Inc. re 3 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, (Prada, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-02-146Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by Margaret Everson, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Margaret Everson(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar