Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUniversity of Washington et al v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv00061
Date Filed2019-01-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffUniversity of Washington a Washington state agency
PlaintiffCenter for Human Rights at the University of Washington a research center created by state law
PlaintiffAngelina Godoy director of the Center
Case DescriptionThe Center for Human Rights at the University of Washington Law School consolidated 13 FOIA requests to the CIA into a single request for records concerning human rights abuses by the El Salvadoran Army. The agency told the Center that processing would take 2-3 months. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-141COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief for violating FOIA against defendant(s) Central Intelligence Agency (Receipt # 0981-5612701), filed by The University of Washington, The Center for Human Rights at The University of Washington, Angelina Godoy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons US Attorney's Office - WA DC, # 5 Summons US Attorney's Office - Seattle)(Clark, Jordan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-15Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (GT) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-152Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Central Intelligence Agency (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(GT) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-02-143ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/21/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar