Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWildEarth Guardians v. Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv00132
Date Filed2019-01-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang
PlaintiffWildEarth Guardians
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement for records concerning WildEarth Guardians' rulemaking petition. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and later told WildEarth Guardians that it had assembled some responsive records. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOffice of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement a federal agency within the
other US Department of the Interior
DefendantUS Department of the Interior a federal agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-151COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior, The, Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6485481)Attorney Travis Earl Stills added to party WildEarth Guardians(pty:pla), filed by WildEarth Guardians. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Stills, Travis) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-152Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-153SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-174SUMMONS REQUEST as to US Attorney General re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff WildEarth Guardians. (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-185SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-236MINUTE ORDER : A Status Conference is SET for 3/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1.23.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-297SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Freedom of Information Act defendant(s) Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019; US Department of the Interior served on 1/18/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar