Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00093
Date Filed2019-01-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffFELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL, LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for the agency's Grants Policy Administration Manual. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request under Exemption 2 (internal practices and procedures) and Exemption 5 (privileges). The law firm filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5890478) filed by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons HHS, # 10 Summons USAG, # 11 Summons US Attorney)(Frisina, Christopher); Modified text at the request of counsel on 1/22/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP (Frisina, Christopher) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-16Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/17/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/16/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/17/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/17/2019. (Frisina, Christopher) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-175ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/17/19. (DM) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-246NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S. Sheffler on behalf of FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL, LLP (Sheffler, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-247NOTICE of Appearance by Khatereh S. Ghiladi on behalf of FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL, LLP (Ghiladi, Khatereh) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar