Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-07 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/7/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by NORRIS WILLIAMS. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-07 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NORRIS WILLIAMS. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-07 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by NORRIS WILLIAMS. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 4 | ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $37.70 from Prison Account of NORRIS WILLIAMS and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/27/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/30/2019) |
2019-01-31 | | Case Reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-01-31 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-08 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/5/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/5/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/5/19. (ztd) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-19 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/19/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 8 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 9 | ORDER directing the defendant to file a status report by April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/22/19. (ms) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/19/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
2019-03-28 | 10 | STATUS REPORT and Motion for a Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-03-28 | 11 | MOTION for Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; (See docket entry no. 10 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-04-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of the defendant's Status Report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by May 17, 2019; the plaintiff shall file his opposition and cross-motion by June 18, 2019; the defendant shall file its reply and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion by July 1, 2019; and the plaintiff shall file his reply by July 22, 2019.Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/22/19. (ms) (Entered: 04/22/2019) |
2019-04-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/18/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 7/1/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/22/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 5/17/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/1/2019. (tj) (Entered: 04/22/2019) |
2019-04-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 5/17/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 6/18/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment/Opposition to Cross Motion due by 7/1/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/22/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/23/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 12 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Kelleigh Miller, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-20 | 13 | Order advising the plaintiff to respond by 6/18/2019 to 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/20/19. (ms) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2019. (hs) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 14 | Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NORRIS WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(ztd); ("Leave to file is Granted" signed 6/7/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-10 | 15 | MOTION to Compel by NORRIS WILLIAMS (ztd); ("Leave to file is Granted" signed 6/10/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 16 | REPLY to Opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) Modified event title on 7/3/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-23 | 17 | MOTION to Strike 16 Memorandum in Opposition, 14 Memorandum in Opposition, 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NORRIS WILLIAMS (ztd) (Entered: 07/25/2019) |
2019-07-29 | 18 | MOTION to Produce by NORRIS WILLIAMS (ztd); ("Leave to file is granted" signed 7/29/19 by Judge Walton) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
2019-09-16 | 19 | MOTION to Supplement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 by NORRIS WILLIAMS (ztd) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2020-01-08 | 20 | Memorandum Opinion and ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 12 the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying the plaintiff's 15 Motion to Compel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26[](a), 17 Motion to Strike Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Cross Summary Judg[]ment, [a]nd Plaintiff's Request [f]or Trial, and 18 Motion to Produce Documents Pursuant to Rule 34(a)(1)(A); and granting the plaintiff's 19 Motion [t]o [S]upplement Pursuant [t]o Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. By February 21, 2020, the defendant either shall release all responsive records to the plaintiff in full, or shall file a renewed summary judgment motion regarding its compliance with the FOIA. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/8/20. (ms) (Entered: 01/08/2020) |
2020-01-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 2/21/2020. (hs) (Entered: 01/08/2020) |
2020-02-20 | 21 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-03-04 | 22 | Letter from Plaintiff ("Leave to file is granted" signed 3/4/2020 by Judge Walton) (ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2020) |
2020-03-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The defendant's 21 Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. By May 1, 2020, the defendant shall file either a report to the Court on the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request to the DEA, or a renewed dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/28/20. (ms) (Entered: 03/28/2020) |
2020-03-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion/Status Report due by 5/1/2020 (hs) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 23 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Rhonda Lisa Campbell (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 24 | STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 25 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE . (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-08 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 25 Certificate of Service; emailed to john.moustakas@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, the Certificate of Service Should be filed with the document. (ztth, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020) |
2020-07-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The defendant shall submit a report to the Court by September 15, 2020, on the status of the Drug Enforcement Administration's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/1/20. (ms) (Entered: 07/01/2020) |
2020-07-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 9/15/2020 (hs) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 26 | STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: On consideration of 26 the Defendant's Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file a status report no later than November 6, 2020 confirming receipt of the documents the Drug Enforcement Administration sent on June 30, 2020, and indicating whether he challenges the DEA's response to his FOIA request. If the plaintiff challenges the DEA's response, he shall identify the basis for his challenge, and the court will set a schedule for dispositive motions. If not, the plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal of this case by November 6, 2020. The plaintiff's failure to file a timely status report or notice may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/16/20. (psu2) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 11/6/2020. (hs) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-11-25 | 27 | ORDER dismissing the complaint and this civil action without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/25/20. (psu2) (Entered: 11/25/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |