Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAVEY v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00106
Date Filed2019-01-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJONATHAN DAVEY
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION United States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-07Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/7/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-071COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JONATHAN DAVEY. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-072MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JONATHAN DAVEY. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-283PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/26/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar