Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRAMDEO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00114
Date Filed2019-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffSONNY AUSTIN RAMDEO
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-11Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 1/11/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by SONNY AUSTIN RAMDEO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through 8) (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-112MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SONNY AUSTIN RAMDEO. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-113PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by SONNY AUSTIN RAMDEO. (zmd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-284ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $20.08 from Prison Account of SONNY AUSTIN RAMDEO and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/26/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31Case Reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-315SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar