Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMeduty v. USA Drivers, Inc. et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv00356
Date Filed2019-01-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael L. Brown
PlaintiffPrince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty
Case DescriptionPrince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty, a truck driver working as a contractor for USA Drivers, Inc. sued the company, asking for access to several documents as well as injunctive relief. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUSA Drivers, Inc.
DefendantRose Griffith Individual
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-221COMPLAINT filed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-222Summons Issued as to USA Drivers, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-223Summons Issued as to Rose Griffith. (eop) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-304ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael L. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-00356-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (tcc) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty re 4 Order Reassigning Case. (tcc) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-305STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/18. (jpa) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty re 5 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-116Return of Service Executed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. USA Drivers, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (rlb) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-117Return of Service Executed by Prince Amun-Ra Hotep Meduty. Rose Griffith served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (rlb) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar