Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState Of New York v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00712
Date Filed2019-01-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffState Of New York
Case DescriptionThe State of New York submitted FOIA requests to the EPA and the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration for records concerning a joint proposal by the two agencies to revise the fuel efficiency standards for cars and light trucks. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the State's requests. The EPA told the State that it would not incur costs. But after hearing nothing further from either agency, the State of New York filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
DefendantNational Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-241FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against State Of New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16239344)Document filed by State Of New York.(Chu, Yueh-ru) Modified on 1/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-242FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Chu, Yueh-ru) Modified on 1/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-243FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Environmental Protection Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Wash D.C.. (Chu, Yueh-ru) Modified on 1/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-244FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by National Highway Traffic Safety Administration. (Chu, Yueh-ru) Modified on 1/25/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-25CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yueh-ru Chu to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yueh-ru Chu to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption entered on civil cover sheet does not exaclty match pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yueh-ru Chu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Environmental Protection Agency, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, State Of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yueh-ru Chu to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption entered on summons requests does not match pleading caption; party name in the 'To' field on the summons request must match party name as it appears in pleading caption; party name on the docket entry must match party name as it appears in pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the corrected summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-255FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Document filed by State Of New York.(Chu, Yueh-ru) Modified on 1/28/2019 (pc). (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-256CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-257REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: 5 Complaint. Document filed by State Of New York. (Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-258REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, re: 5 Complaint. Document filed by State Of New York. (Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-28***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yueh-ru Chu to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-28***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yueh-ru Chu to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons when you correct and refile your pleading.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-289COMPLAINT against National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Document filed by State Of New York.(Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2910REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: 9 Complaint. Document filed by State Of New York. (Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-2911REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, re: 9 Complaint. Document filed by State Of New York. (Chu, Yueh-ru) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-3012ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-3013ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Highway Traffic Safety Administration. (dnh) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar