Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5908913) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 01/25/2019) |
2019-01-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 01/25/2019) |
2019-01-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-02-01 | 4 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Case related to Case No. 19-180. (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
2019-03-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the defendant shall file its answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before April 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 20, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or other response to Complaint due by 4/19/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/24/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before May 10, 2019. The report shall include the parties' respective positions on whether cases 19-cv-180, 19-cv-181, and 19-cv-182 should be consolidated. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 19, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2019. (mac) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 8 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Casale, Ralph); Modified on 4/26/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 9 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Casale, Ralph); Modified on 4/26/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-04-26 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 8 Affidavit was entered in error at the request of counsel. Said pleading was filed in the wrong case. 9 Affidavit was entered in error at the request of counsel. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the correct event under Service of Process. (tth) Modified on 4/26/2019. (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/10/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/21/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-14 | | Cases Consolidated. Cases 19cv180 has been consolidated with 19cv181, pursuant to an Order entered on 5/14/2019. (tth) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-07-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for the parties to file their next joint status report. It is thus ORDERED that the parties shall file their next joint status report on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 29, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
2019-07-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 9, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 13, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-09-09 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 13 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 16, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 9, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 16, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 17, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/17/2019) |
2019-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 16, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 16, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
2021-04-26 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Miano on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00180-DLF, 1:19-cv-00181-DLF(Miano, John) (Entered: 04/26/2021) |
2021-05-28 | 13 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Brian Field Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00180-DLF, 1:19-cv-00181-DLF(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/28/2021) |
2021-06-22 | 14 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 14 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 22, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |