Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUTT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00155
Date Filed2019-01-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffBABAR JAVED BUTT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-17Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/17/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(zef, ) # 2 Summons) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-172MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zef, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-174PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zef, ) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-183MOTION to Seal 1 Complaint by BABAR JAVED BUTT (zef, ) Modified to add link on 1/29/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-02-065ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of BABAR JAVED BUTT. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/6/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-066ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Seal Document 3 MOTION to Seal Document (See order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/6/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar