Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against David L. Bernhardt, James Kurth, United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12135044.), filed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Declaration of Taiga Takahashi) The new case number is 3:19-cv-193-GPC-WVG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Takahashi, Taiga)(tcf) (jao). (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 2 | NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Golden Door Properties, LLC. No Parties With Financial Interest. (tcf) (jao). (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-01-29 | 3 | Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao). (Entered: 01/29/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 4 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. All Defendants served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Proof of Service)(Takahashi, Taiga) qc email, each summons returned executed should be filed individually (dlg). (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. United States Department of the Interior served. (Takahashi, Taiga) (dlg). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. David L. Bernhardt served. (Takahashi, Taiga) (dlg). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 7 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. United States Fish and Wildlife Service served. (Takahashi, Taiga) (dlg). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | 8 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Door Properties, LLC. James Kurth served. (Takahashi, Taiga) (dlg). (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 9 | Joint MOTION for Order re: Case Management by Golden Door Properties, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Takahashi, Taiga) (dlg). (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 10 | ORDER Granting Joint 9 Motion for Order. Defendants U.S. Department of the Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service shall provide Plaintiff with search information regarding Plaintiff's FOIA requests at issue in this suit by April 8, 2019, and the parties shall meet and confer by May 1, 2019; Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint shall be extended to June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/2/19. (dlg) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 11 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft) (dlg). (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 12 | ORDER Granting Joint 11 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Defendants U.S. Department of the Interior and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service must respond to the complaint by July 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/13/19. (dlg) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-07-18 | 13 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, for Decalratory and Injunctive Releif for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act 5 U.S.C. 552 by United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service.(Church, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/18/2019) |
2019-09-13 | 14 | NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Telephonic Status Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation of your case will be held on October 21, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. before United States Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Additionally, on October 8, 2019, beginning at 8:00 A.M., the Court will hold an attorneys-only telephonic status conference with each party separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/12/19.(dlg) (Entered: 09/13/2019) |
2019-09-26 | 15 | Joint MOTION to Vacate 14 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, by United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Church, Rebecca) (dlg). (Entered: 09/26/2019) |
2019-09-27 | 16 | ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint 15 Motion to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation and Telephonic Status Conference. Counsel for each party is to telephonically appear on Tuesday, October 8, 2019, at 8:00 A.M. for the Pre-ENE conference, and not on October 4, 2019 as the Parties indicated in their Joint Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/26/19. (dlg) (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 17 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/8/2019. Order to follow setting status conference with Parties.(no document attached) (djk) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-10-08 | 18 | ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Joint Status Conference. The Parties are ordered to telephonically appear for a joint status conference on Wednesday, November 6, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/8/19.(dlg) (Entered: 10/08/2019) |
2019-11-06 | 19 | ORDER Continuing Joint Status Conference. The Court finds that good cause supports the request and vacates today's joint status conference and CONTINUES it to 7:30 A.M. on Tuesday, December 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/6/19.(dlg) (Entered: 11/06/2019) |
2019-12-03 | 20 | ORDER Setting Joint Status Conference. The Court orders counsel for the Parties and a representative with authority from the Department of Interior to telephonically appear for a joint status conference on Wednesday, December 18, 2019, at 8:00 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/3/19.(dlg) (Entered: 12/03/2019) |
2019-12-17 | 21 | NOTICE of Decision by United States Department of the Interior re 20 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Church, Rebecca) (rmc). (Entered: 12/17/2019) |
2019-12-18 | 22 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 12/18/2019. Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference to follow.(no document attached) (djk) (Entered: 12/18/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 23 | Order Scheduling Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 4/20/20. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 4/20/20, then a Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/20/19.(dlg) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2020-03-02 | 24 | Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Church, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 25 | ORDER Granting Joint 24 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/2/20. (dlg) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |