Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00209
Date Filed2019-01-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING
Case DescriptionThe Center for Responsible Lending submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning payday, vehicle title, and high-cost installment loans. CRL also requested a fee waiver. OMB acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CRL filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-281COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5912201) filed by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to OMB, # 3 Summons to the Attorney General, # 4 Summons to the U.S. Attorney)(Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR RESPONSIBLE LENDING (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/4/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar