Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBEST v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00256
Date Filed2019-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffEMMA BEST
Case DescriptionEmma Best, a freelance writer, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the Church Committee. She also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI disclosed 123 pages that had been previously processed. Best filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy, which remanded her request to the FBI to search for further responsive records. The FBI told Best that it had located 18,615 potentially responsive records, which would cost $565 if disclosed fully. The FBI then told Best that it had denied her fee waiver. Best submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the Pike Committee. The FBI acknowledged receipt of that request. After hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either request, Best filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5917412) filed by EMMA BEST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-312SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-073ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 02/7/19. (DM) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-084NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar