Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNBCUniversal Media LLC et al v. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00933
Date Filed2019-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William H. Pauley, III
PlaintiffNBCUniversal Media LLC
PlaintiffThomas Winter
Case DescriptionThomas Winter, an investigative reporter for NBC News, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between Sen. Roger Wicker (R-MS) and then attorney General Jeff Sessions pertaining to the extradition of Dmitri Firtash, a Ukranian national who had been detained in Austria. Winter also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Winter's request for expedited processing. Winter filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further, Winter and NBC Universal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-301COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16269242)Document filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Thomas Winter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Erik Bierbauer. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Erik Bierbauer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (sj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (sj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-312REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC, Thomas Winter. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-313CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-314RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation for NBCUniversal Media LLC. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC.(Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-015ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (dnh) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-016ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/1/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-137SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE). Department Of Justice served on 2/4/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by NBCUniversal Media LLC; Thomas Winter. (Bierbauer, Erik) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar