Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00279
Date Filed2019-02-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Privacy Information Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning an agency directive on Border Search of Electronic Devices. EPIC also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency did not acknowledge of the request. EPIC contacted the agency to inquire about the receipt of the request and was told that the agency had no record of receiving the request. EPIC resubmitted the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-011COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5922587) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Customs and Border Protection, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Scott, Jeramie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-04Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-073ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/7/19. (DM) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar