Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5923334) filed by SHORELIGHT EDUCATION, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Haller, David) (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/4/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 02/01/2019) |
2019-02-04 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: # 2 Summons). Modified on 2/4/2019 (zmd). (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-06 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/5/2019 (Haller, David) Modified entry. Service has not been received on the U.S. Attorney or U.S. Attorney General on 2/6/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 02/06/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/11/2019. (Haller, David) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-12 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2019. (Haller, David) (Entered: 03/12/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-04-01 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Fresco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fresco, Leon) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/1/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 04/01/2019) |
2019-04-04 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 4/30/19. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/4/19. (DJS) (Entered: 04/04/2019) |
2019-04-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/30/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint May 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/2/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/30/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 7/8/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/5/19. (DJS) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2019. (tb) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-07-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
2019-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by August 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/8/19. (DJS) (Entered: 07/08/2019) |
2019-07-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by 8/8/2019. (jth) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-08-08 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/08/2019) |
2019-08-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit their next Joint Status Report and, if necessary, a proposed schedule for further proceedings by October 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/2019. (lctsc3) (Entered: 08/08/2019) |
2019-08-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2019. (tb) (Entered: 08/09/2019) |
2019-10-16 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |