Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00310
Date Filed2019-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning emails sent or received by former Labor Secretary Tom Perez on his government or personal email account from 2013 to 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Citizens United that it was processing the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5933433) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Dept of Labor, # 4 Summons to US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-07Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-124NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-205Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. 5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to file its answer or to otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/20/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar