Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuzzfeed, Inc. v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv01219
Date Filed2019-02-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffBuzzfeed, Inc.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed News submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for a copy of its database of completed I-589 applications, known as the Refugee Asylum and Parole System database. BuzzFeed also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied BuzzFeed's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-081COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16315479)Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit C - Expedited Processing)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-082CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-083REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-084RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-085NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-116ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jgo) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-117NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/11/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-208CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service on U.S. Attorney - SDNY, # 2 Exhibit Service on U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Service on U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-259NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Adam Chase on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Chase, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/25/2019. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-2610NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Bretz on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2019. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0411ORDER: Upon consideration of the CONSENT MOTION FOR MATTHEW L. SCHAFER TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR BUZZFEED, INC., it is this 3rd day of March 2019, hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. (Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/3/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2019. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2019. Argument is set for July 2, 2019 at 4:00pm. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-1812ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Bretz, Emily) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar