Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-02-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Department of Justice, Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16334962)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 3 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 4 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 5 | STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-12 | 6 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-13 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | | Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | | CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 19-cv-234. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 7 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-13 | 8 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of State. (jgo) (Entered: 02/13/2019) |
2019-02-15 | | CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | | NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-15 | | Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (bcu) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-02-27 | | CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | 9 | ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (anc) Modified on 2/27/2019 (anc). (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of Justice answer due 3/18/2019; Department of State answer due 3/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-18 | 10 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Department of Justice, Department of State. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-18 | 11 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-19 | 12 | NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/19/2019) (anc) (Entered: 03/19/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 13 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Department of Justice, Department of State on March 20, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-04-15 | 14 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by David James Sandler on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-15 | 15 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by David James Sandler on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative (Sandler, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-15 | 16 | JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 4/15/2019 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/15/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 17 | CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 4/18/2019 re: requesting initial conference be moved to 1pm on 4/19/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 18 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (28 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 17 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby adjourns this conference to noon on Friday, April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-22 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/22/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 04/22/2019) |
2019-04-23 | 19 | SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-captioned actions having been consolidated, see ECF No. 23 in 19 Civ. 234, absent further order of the Court, all filings in these matters going forward shall be made under the docket number 19 Civ. 234. The parties shall negotiate in good faith to narrow the scope of the search or exclude categories of non-substantive records identified by Defendants. On April 26, 2019, and every Friday thereafter until directed by the Court, the Parties shall update the Court in a joint letter on the status of discussions between the Parties and Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs Requests; and as further set forth herein. Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 04/23/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 20 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Department of Justice served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by ceritifed mail and Also served The U. S. Attorney General. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 21 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Department of State served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 22 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Hao Jun Lie. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 23 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 24 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (23 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 37 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ks) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 25 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) and proposal for letter-briefing schedule regarding State's processing rate Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 26 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (25 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and approves the parties' proposed letter briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/13/2019. Responses due by 5/20/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ne) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 27 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/10/2019) |
2019-05-10 | 28 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (41 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 27 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 29 | FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Continue processing at a rate of 300 pages per month addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/13/2019. Document filed by Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Stein Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Stein Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Stein Declaration)(Teleanu, Natasha) Modified on 5/14/2019 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-14 | | ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Natasha Waglow Teleanu to RE-FILE Document 29 LETTER MOTION to Continue processing at a rate of 300 pages per month addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/13/2019. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-14 | 30 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/13/2019 re: Processing rate. Document filed by Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Stein Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Stein Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Stein Declaration)(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-17 | 31 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-20 | 32 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated May 20, 2019 re: opposition to the 5/13/19 DOS letter requesting the Court to approve States proposed processing rate of only 300 pages per month.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-05-21 | 33 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated 5/21/19 re: parties' consent to the over-length letter (Dkt. 44) and requesting the court to accept the over-length letter. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 34 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (45 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 33 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court will accept the over-length letter on the consent of all parties. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-22 | 35 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (31 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 36 | JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/24/2019 re: weekly status update. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 37 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 48 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court adjourns State's May 29 and May 30 deadlines. The parties should confer and provide the Court new deadlines by June 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rro) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-30 | 38 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (32 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Having reviewed the parties' competing letters, the Court's judgment is that a processing rate of 5,000 pages per month, beginning June 2019, appropriately balances the urgency of this particular request with the State Department's concerns regarding the burdens of making FOTA productions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-05-31 | 39 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/31/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 40 | ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court reschedules the conference currently scheduled for June 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. that same day. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-03 | 41 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (51 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/03/2019) |
2019-06-04 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 6/4/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Arnoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 42 | ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. The parties shall continue to provide the Court with joint weekly status updates, continuing June 7, 2019, and continuing every Friday thereafter; 2. The Department of Defense shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 17, 2019. It shall process 2,500 pages of responsive records by June 30, 2019, and thereafter process 5,000 pages per month; 3. The Department of Justice shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 5, 2019. It shall process responsive records at a rate of 5,000 pages per month; 4. The Department of State shall complete its search of classified and unclassified emails within 4.5 weeks; 5. The next status conference is scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/5/2019) (mml) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 43 | CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 6/7/2019 re: seeking limited clarification and/or modification of the Court's June 5, 2019 processing order as to DOD. Document filed by Department of Defense.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-07 | 44 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/07/2019) |
2019-06-10 | 45 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court appreciates the parties' collective efforts to create clearer proposed language. The Court adopts the language herein as superseding paragraphs 2 and 3 of its June 5, 2019 Order. Dkt. 54. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/10/2019) |
2019-06-10 | 46 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (56 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court is cognizant of DOD's anticipated motion for reconsideration and authorizes the Government to attach a declaration in support. The Court reiterates, however, that unless and until the Court grants any motion for reconsideration, all Orders remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/10/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 47 | MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 48 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 49 | DECLARATION of Mark H. Herrington in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 50 | DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-14 | 51 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/14/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 52 | PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Sandler, David) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-17 | 53 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated June 17, 2019 re: withdrawal as counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Sandler, David) (Entered: 06/17/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 54 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 55 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (53 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David James Sandler terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 56 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (54 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 57 | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the FBI, and their respective counsel, that: Plaintiff releases and discharges the FBI from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted - or could have asserted - in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the FBI, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) Modified on 6/25/2019 (anc). (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-27 | 58 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . / Plaintiff OSJI's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-06-27 | 59 | DECLARATION of Catherine Amirfar in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu, dated May 31, 2019, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email from David Sandler to Natasha Teleanu, dated June 11, 2019, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu and Peter Aronoff, dated June 24, 2019, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Department of State to Amrit Singh, dated December 21, 2018)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 60 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 61 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (74 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 60 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/1/2019) (ks) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 62 | MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee of $200.00 paid, receipt no. ANYSDC-17176407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Forbes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Matthew D. Forbes Certificates of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jc). (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-02 | | >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (76 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 62 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jc) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-02 | 63 | ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 62 Motion for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/02/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/02/2019) |
2019-07-03 | 64 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-03 | 65 | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-03 | 66 | DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-08 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 7/8/2019. Amrit Singh & Matthew Forbes present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-07-09 | 67 | ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following dates and deadlines: 1. The parties shall provide the Court with joint bi-weekly status updates, beginning July 18, 2019, and continuing every other Thursday thereafter; 2. The next status conference is scheduled for August 8, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED., Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rj) (Entered: 07/09/2019) |
2019-07-18 | 68 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/18/2019) |
2019-07-19 | 69 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (84 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 68 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and the parties' ongoing efforts to discuss technologies that would make FOIA productions more relevant and efficient. The Court does not require a supplement to this letter before the next scheduled bi-weekly update unless the parties believe they have reached an impasse on an issue that requires the Court's attention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 07/19/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 70 | LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew D. Forbes dated August 1, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 71 | ORDER granting (86) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (70) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The status conference currently scheduled for August 8, 2019 is hereby adjourned to August 12, 2019 at 10:00. (Status Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 72 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-02 | 73 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (72 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 88 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and will take up any outstanding issues at the next conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(cf) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 74 | OPINION & ORDER re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State : For the reasons reviewed above, the Court denies the motions by the State Department and DOD for reconsideration of the monthly processing rates set by the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to deny the motion pending at Dkt. 61. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-09 | 75 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 9, 2019 re: August 12, 2019 conference. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # 2 Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # 3 Exhibit C-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # 4 Exhibit D Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # 5 Exhibit E Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # 6 Exhibit F Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # 7 Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/09/2019) |
2019-08-09 | 76 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 8/9/2019 re: response to plaintiff's letter. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/09/2019) |
2019-08-10 | 77 | LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Letter Motion Requesting Permission to File Overlength Letter (Docket No. 91 in 19-cv-234 and 75 in 19-cv-1329) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 10, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Three-Page Letter from C. Amirfar to the Hon. Paul A. Engelmayer, # 2 Exhibit A - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # 3 Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # 4 Exhibit C - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # 5 Exhibit D - Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # 6 Exhibit E - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # 7 Exhibit F - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # 8 Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/10/2019) |
2019-08-13 | 78 | ORDER: At yesterday's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. By August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the outcomes of the State Department's test of certain search terms and setting out their respective views as to this subject. 2. Also by August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the State Department's efforts to prioritize processing of documents consistent with Plaintiff's preferences. 3. The next status conference is scheduled for September 27, 2019 at 9 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status letter three days prior to the conference. (Status Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-13 | 79 | ORDER granting (93) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 08/13/2019) |
2019-08-26 | 80 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) per the Court's August 13 order Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/26/2019) |
2019-09-24 | 81 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/24/2019) |
2019-09-27 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 9/27/2019. Amrit Singh & Ashika Singh present for Plaintiff. AUSAs Natasha Telanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 09/27/2019) |
2019-10-03 | 82 | ORDER: At the conference on September 27, 2019, the Court adopted the following briefing schedule, suggested by the parties in their joint status update, Dkt. 99, for the cross-motions for summary judgment to be filed by CIA and ODNI together and by OSJI: CIA and ODNI's brief in support of their summary judgment motion is due December 5, 2019; OSJI' s brief in support of its summary judgment motion and in opposition to CIA and ODNI's motion is due January 16, 2020; CIA and ODNI's brief containing their reply and their opposition to OSJI's motion is due February 6, 2020; and OSJI's reply brief is due February 27, 2020. The parties are instructed to submit a joint status update outlining the status of the case as to all parties every four weeks, with the first letter due October 25, 2019. (Motions due by 1/16/2020. Responses due by 2/6/2020. Replies due by 2/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-11 | 83 | PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Security Agency, Department of Justice. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/11/2019) |
2019-10-15 | 84 | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY AND DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the NSA and DOJ, and their respective counsel, that: Plaintiff releases and discharges the NSA and DOJ from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted-or could have asserted-in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the NSA and DOJ, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party, and as further set forth in this Stipulation of Dismissal. So ordered. Department of Justice terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/15/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2019) |
2019-10-25 | 85 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2019) |
2019-10-28 | 86 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (85 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 105 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and looks forward to the parties' next joint status letter, due in four weeks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ks) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 87 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 88 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (107 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 87 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and looks forward to receiving summary judgment briefing beginning December 5, 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 11/25/2019) |
2019-12-05 | 89 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 12/5/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 90 | JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated December 20, 2019 Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2019-12-26 | 91 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (90 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 117 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/26/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 12/26/2019) |
2020-01-13 | 92 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (110 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 13, 2020. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/13/2020) |
2020-01-17 | 93 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 94 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (121 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 93 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/21/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(yv) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 95 | CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Responses due by 2/7/2020(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 96 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of OSJI's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 97 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of OSJI's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 98 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Opposition re: (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement from President Donald J. Trump on Standing with Saudi Arabia, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of an interview with Vice President Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Article titled President Trump on divided Congress, Mueller probe, foreign challenges, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Article titled Senate Dem on Armed Services panel: Trump lying about CIA report on Khashoggi, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of statements made by Secretary of Defense James N. Mattis, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Article titled Lawmakers livid after CIA director Gina Haspel a no-show for closed-door briefing on Khashoggi murder, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of a hearing before the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence, S. Hrg 116-75, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Article titled Trump Lied When He Said CIA Didnt Link Saudi Prince To Khashoggi Killing: Senator Jack Reed, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Article titled A 'Smoking Saw' Links Saudi Prince to Khashoggis Murder, Senator Says, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Article titled Jamal Khashoggi: US spy chief given deadline to name Saudi writer's killers, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Copy of a tweet from Sen. Tim Kaine)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 99 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement from President Donald J. Trump on Standing with Saudi Arabia, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of an interview with Vice President Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Article titled "President Trump on divided Congress, Mueller probe, foreign challenges", # 4 Exhibit 4 - Article titled "Senate Dem on Armed Services panel: Trump lying about CIA report on Khashoggi", # 5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of statements made by Secretary of Defense James N. Mattis, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Article titled "Lawmakers livid after CIA director Gina Haspel a no-show for closed-door briefing on Khashoggi murder", # 7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of a hearing before the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence, S. Hrg 116-75, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Article titled "Trump Lied When He Said CIA Didn't Link Saudi Prince To Khashoggi Killing: Senator Jack Reed", # 9 Exhibit 9 - Article titled "A 'Smoking Saw' Links Saudi Prince to Khashoggi's Murder, Senator Says", # 10 Exhibit 10 - Article titled "Jamal Khashoggi: US spy chief given deadline to name Saudi writer's killers", # 11 Exhibit 11 - Copy of a tweet from Sen. Tim Kaine)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-01-21 | 100 | LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument / Letter Requesting Oral Argument on Defendants CIA and ODNI's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 21, 2020. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
2020-02-06 | 101 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition/reply papers on cross-motions for summary judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/6/2020. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2020) |
2020-02-11 | 102 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of summary judgment briefing schedule addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/11/2020. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/11/2020) |
2020-02-12 | 103 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated 02/12/20 re: Plaintiff's Letter in Response to Defendants' Letter Motion For Extension Filed at Dockets 131 and 102, respectively. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2020) |
2020-02-14 | 104 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 105 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: ( 104 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 135 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update and looks forward to the Government's letter today. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (rjm) Modified on 2/18/2020 (rjm). (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 106 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha Teleanu dated 2/18/2020 re: response to Court's order (134). Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-02-19 | 107 | ORDER: The Court grants the Government's request in order to allow the Government time to supplement the CIAs search, as described in the Government's February 18, 2020 letter, and to ensure that the CIA has captured all responsive records. As a result, the remaining briefing schedule is as follows: The Government's brief containing its reply and its opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due March 10, 2020, four weeks from the date of the Government's original request for an extension; and Plaintiff's reply brief is due March 31, 2020. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment , (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 3/10/2020, Replies due by 3/31/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 02/19/2020) |
2020-03-10 | 108 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-10 | 109 | DECLARATION of Gregory M. Koch in Opposition re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-10 | 110 | NOTICE of classified filing (Classified Declaration of Gregory M. Koch) re: (108 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-10 | 111 | NOTICE of classified filing (Classified Declaration of Vanna Blaine) re: (108 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020) |
2020-03-13 | 112 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-03-17 | 113 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (143 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 112 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/17/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 03/17/2020) |
2020-03-27 | 114 | LETTER MOTION to Stay the State Department's Monthly Processing Requirement addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 3/27/2020. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/27/2020) |
2020-03-30 | 115 | ORDER granting (145) Letter Motion to Stay in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (114) Letter Motion to Stay in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The State Department's processing requirements will be stayed beginning in April 2020. The parties are to provide a joint update on the stay every two weeks, beginning on April 10, 2020. The Court hopes counsel and their families are safe and well during this time. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2020) |
2020-03-31 | 116 | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Reply in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-03-31 | 117 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Washington Post Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ODNI Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CIA Email)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-04-10 | 118 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/10/2020) |
2020-04-13 | 119 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (118 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 149 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/13/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 04/13/2020) |
2020-04-24 | 120 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/24/2020) |
2020-04-28 | 121 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 120 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for the update. The stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/28/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 04/28/2020) |
2020-05-08 | 122 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/08/2020) |
2020-05-11 | 123 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (122 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 153 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ama) (Entered: 05/11/2020) |
2020-05-11 | | *** Set/Clear Flags *** Added flag(s):STAYED., Case Stayed Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ama) (Entered: 05/11/2020) |
2020-05-21 | 124 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/21/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 125 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (124 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 155 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update. The stay remains in place. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/26/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 126 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-06-19 | 127 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/19/2020) |
2020-06-22 | 128 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (127 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 158 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/22/2020) (ks) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-07-02 | 129 | STATUS REPORT. including joint proposal for modification of stay Document filed by Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fourth Declaration of Eric F. Stein).(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 07/02/2020) |
2020-07-06 | 130 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (129 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The stay remains in place. Defendants are to provide any productions on the third Wednesday of each month, and the parties are directed to submit monthly status reports. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (rro) (Entered: 07/06/2020) |
2020-08-07 | 131 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/07/2020) |
2020-08-07 | 132 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (161 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 131 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The stay remains in place. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (mro) (Entered: 08/10/2020) |
2020-09-04 | 133 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/04/2020) |
2020-09-08 | 134 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (163 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 133 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. the stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ks) (Entered: 09/08/2020) |
2020-10-02 | 135 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-02 | 136 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (135 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 166 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-10-14 | 137 | LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Ashika Singh dated 10/14/20 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure D.C. District Court decision)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-11-06 | 138 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) and proposal for further status report by December 4, 2020 Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 139 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: (138 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 170 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/9/2020) (nb) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-12-04 | 140 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 141 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (140 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 174 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The parties are ordered to file another status report on January 7, 2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-08 | 142 | OPINION & ORDER re: (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment, (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment: The Court therefore grants in part and denies in part each side's motion for summary judgment. As more fully discussed herein, the CIA and ODNI are ordered to produce a Vaughn index, limited to the two items (the tape of the killing of Jamal Khashoggi and the CIA's report on the killing) whose existence and possession the Court has found to have been officially acknowledged. This index is due two weeks from today. In addition, all parties are directed to confer and submit a joint letter as to the next steps in this litigation, also due two weeks from today. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions pending at dockets 111, 123, and 128. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 12/08/2020) |
2020-12-10 | 143 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to February 8, 2021 for the government to either produce a Vaughn index per the Court's summary judgment opinion and order, or file a notice of appeal addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 12/10/2020. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 144 | ORDER granting (177) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (143) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The Court's December 8, 2020 opinion and order, ECF No. 176 (the "Order"), is modified as follows. By February 8, 2021, the government shall either file a notice of appeal or produce a Vaughn index as directed by the Order. If the government files a notice of appeal by February 8, the portion of the Order directing production of the Vaughn index shall be stayed pending the outcome of the appeal. The parties shall also file a status letter by February 12, 2021, as to the next steps in this litigation. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 145 | INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 142 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 146 | INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 142 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 147 | INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 142 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2021-01-05 | 148 | MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | 149 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | 150 | NOTICE of lodging of supplemental classified declarations re: (179 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-06 | 151 | ORDER: The Court has received the Government's motion for partial reconsideration of the Court's December 8, 2020 Opinion. Plaintiff's response is due January 21, 2021. And defendants' reply is due February 4, 2021. Although defendants do not have a right to come forward with additional evidence after the Court has issued its Opinion, the Court, in considering the motion for partial reconsideration, will examine the two supplemental classified declarations that the defendants have submitted in camera. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 1/21/2021, Replies due by 2/4/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/6/2021) (jca) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-07 | 152 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/07/2021) |
2021-01-08 | 153 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (183 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 152 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The patties are ordered to file another status report on February 8, 2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/8/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 01/08/2021) |
2021-01-12 | 154 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 12, 2021. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/12/2021) |
2021-01-12 | 155 | ORDER granting (185) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (179 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration: Granted. (Responses due by 2/2/2021. Replies due by 2/16/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/12/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 01/12/2021) |
2021-01-15 | 156 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time by one week for State to complete its January production addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 1/15/2021. Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2021) |
2021-01-19 | 157 | ORDER granting (187) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/19/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (nb) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-19 | 158 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time in part of the February 8 Vaughn index deadline while the government's partial reconsideration motion is pending addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 1/19/2021. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-20 | 159 | ORDER terminating (189) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; terminating (158) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The Court's December 8, 2020 opinion and order, ECF No. 176, and December 14, 2020 order, ECF No. 178 (together, the "Orders") are modified as follows. The portion of the Orders directing the government to produce a Vaughn index of the tape of the killing of Jamal Khashoggi is stayed pending the Court's resolution of the government's motion for partial reconsideration, ECF No. 179. If the Court denies the government's motion for partial reconsideration, the government will have 60 days from the date of that denial either to comply with the Court's orders or file a notice of appeal. If the government files a timely notice of appeal, all orders directing production of a Vaughn index regarding the tape will be stayed pending appeal. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/20/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 01/20/2021) |
2021-02-02 | 160 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (179 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part . . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-02 | 161 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Opposition re: (179 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Biden Statement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Haines Confirmation Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Haines PHQs, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Special Rapporteur Report, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Sabah Article, # 6 Exhibit 6 - BBC Article)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-08 | 162 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-08 | 163 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to produce Vaughn index addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff & Natasha Teleanu dated 2/8/2021. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/08/2021) |
2021-02-09 | 164 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (162 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 193 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The parties are ordered to file another status report on March 9, 2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/9/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (cf) (Entered: 02/09/2021) |
2021-02-09 | 165 | ORDER granting (194) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to produce Vaughn index in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/9/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 02/09/2021) |
2021-02-11 | 166 | LETTER MOTION for Conference re: (178 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, / request for status conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated February 10, 2021. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-11 | 167 | ORDER granting (197) Letter Motion for Conference in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. The Court appreciates this update, and schedules a status conference for March 24, 2021 at 3 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/11/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-11 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (jca) Modified on 2/22/2021 (jca). (Entered: 02/22/2021) |
2021-02-16 | 168 | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (148 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/16/2021) |
2021-02-25 | 169 | ORDER: Prompted by the Government's recent classified submissions, the Court will hold an ex parte classified hearing. The Classified Information Security Officer assigned to this case has been instructed to contact the Government and make the necessary arrangements for this hearing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/25/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 02/25/2021) |
2021-03-09 | 170 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-03-09 | 171 | ORDER granting (179) Motion for Reconsideration re (179 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Memorandum & Opinion,,, in part . filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. In light of this ruling, the Court grants the Government's motion for partial reconsideration insofar as the Government argued, on the basis of its newly filed classified submissions, that issuing a Vaughn index with respect to whether or not the agencies possess a tape "could cause specific and identifiable harms to national security." Dkt. 180 at 10. The Court denies the Government's motion for partial reconsideration insofar as the Government argued that the Court had erred in finding that official statements as to the agencies' possession of the tape constituted an official acknowledgment, precluding the agencies from making a Glomar response. Id. at 1. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 179. As previously ordered, see Dkt. 98, the Court will hold a telephonic status conference in this matter on March 24, 2021 at 3 p.m. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/9/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-03-09 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jca) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-03-24 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephone Conference held on 3/24/2021. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 03/25/2021) |
2021-03-29 | 172 | PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/29/2021) |
2021-03-31 | 173 | SCHEDULING ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties propose the following consolidated briefing schedule: 1. CIA shall file a motion for summary judgment regarding the withheld CIA Report by May 5, 2021;2. OSJI shall file its opposition to CIA's motion, cross-motion for summary judgment with regard to the CIA Report, and motion for reconsideration by June 2, 2021; 3. CIA shall file its reply brief and opposition to OSJI's cross-motion with regard to the CIA report, and CIA and ODNI shall file their opposition to the motion for reconsideration, by June 23, 2021; 4. OSJI shall file any reply brief in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment and motion for reconsideration by July 14, 2021. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/2/2021. Cross Motions due by 6/2/2021. Responses due by 6/23/2021, Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/31/2021) |
2021-04-07 | 174 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-07 | 175 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (174 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The parties are ordered to file another status report on May 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/7/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-14 | 176 | TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/24/2021 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/14/2021) |
2021-04-14 | 177 | NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/24/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/14/2021) |
2021-04-28 | 178 | CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 4/28/2021 re: consent proposal for consolidated briefing of motions in 19 Civ. 234 and 20 Civ. 6625. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/28/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 179 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (51 in 1:20-cv-06625-PAE) Letter, filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/29/2021) (va) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 180 | LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated May 4, 2021. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 181 | ORDER: granting (211) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (180) Letter Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Cross Motions due by 6/7/2021. Motions due by 5/10/2021. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/04/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ama) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/28/2021 Replies due by 7/19/2021. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ama) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-04 | | Terminate Transcript Deadlines Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ama) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-07 | 182 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/07/2021) |
2021-05-11 | 183 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (213 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 182 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The parties are ordered to file another status report on June 10, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/11/2021) (js) (Entered: 05/11/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 184 | CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Responses due by 6/28/2021.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 185 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 184 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Memorandum of Law in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Its Motion for Partial Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 186 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: 184 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2021 ODNI Assessment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Interview with Vice President Mike Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2020 NICM, # 4 Exhibit 4 -CIA Letter re Vaughn index, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Haines Confirmation Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 1277 and 5714 of NDAA, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Haspel Statement, # 8 Exhibit 8 - WSJ article, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Washington Post article).(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 187 | MOTION for Reconsideration re; 142 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 188 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 142 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative..(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 189 | DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: 187 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 142 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2021 ODNI Assessment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Interview with Vice President Mike Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2020 NICM, # 4 Exhibit 4 - CIA Letter re Vaughn index, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Haines Confirmation Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 1277 and 5714 of NDAA, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Haspel Statement, # 8 Exhibit 8 - WSJ article, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Washington Post article).(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-10 | 190 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/10/2021) |
2021-06-14 | 191 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (228 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 190 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/11/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (kv) (Entered: 06/14/2021) |
2021-06-28 | 192 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (184 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (187 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (142) Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . and in further support of the CIA's motion for summary judgment . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-06-28 | 193 | DECLARATION of Gregory M. Koch in Opposition re: (220 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (184 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (187 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (142) Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (225 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176) Memorandum & Opinion,,, / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-06-28 | 194 | DECLARATION of Vanna Blaine in Opposition re: (220 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (184 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (187 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (142) Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (225 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176) Memorandum & Opinion,,, / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-07-12 | 195 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/12/2021) |
2021-07-13 | 196 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (233 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 195 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/13/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 07/13/2021) |
2021-07-16 | 197 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated July 16, 2021. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
2021-07-19 | 198 | ORDER granting (235) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/19/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-07-19 | 199 | ORDER granting 197 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/19/2021) (va) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-07-19 | 200 | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (220 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (184 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Further Support of Its Motion for Partial Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-07-19 | 201 | REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (142) Memorandum & Opinion,,, Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration ., (225 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176) Memorandum & Opinion,,, / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Further Support of Its Motion for Partial Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 07/19/2021) |
2021-07-22 | 202 | LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Consolidated Summary Judgment Motions, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated 7/22/2021. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 07/22/2021) |
2021-08-06 | 203 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Arnpriester on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative..(Arnpriester, Natasha) (Entered: 08/06/2021) |
2021-08-13 | 204 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/13/2021) |
2021-08-16 | 205 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (241 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/16/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 08/16/2021) |
2021-09-13 | 206 | OPINION & ORDER re: (214 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency; (220 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration , filed by Open Society Justice Initiative; (239 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on Consolidated Summary Judgment Motions, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated 7/22/2021, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative, (225 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration re; (176) Memorandum & Opinion / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Reconsideration , filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. For the foregoing reasons, the Court (1) grants the Government's motion for summary judgment, (2) denies OSJI's cross-motion for summary judgment, and (3) denies OSJI's motion for reconsideration. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate the motions pending at dockets 214, 220, 225, 239. The Court directs counsel, within two weeks of this ruling, to submit a joint letter identifying any open issues-and if so, proposing next steps-in this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/13/2021) (va) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/13/2021) |
2021-09-13 | 207 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/13/2021) |
2021-09-14 | 208 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (244 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 207 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The parties will provide another status update by November 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/14/2021) (va) (Entered: 09/14/2021) |
2021-09-27 | 209 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/27/2021) |
2021-09-28 | 210 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (246 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The parties are directed to include in their status update due November 5, 2021, the amount of time that they believe necessary to resolve with finality plaintiffs' records requests directed to the two remaining defendants, the Department of State and the Department of Defense. The Court thanks the parties for this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/28/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 09/28/2021) |
2021-11-05 | 211 | STATUS REPORT. and proposal for further status report by January 28, 2022 Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 11/05/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 212 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (211 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 248 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties are directed to provide a further status update to the Court by January 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/8/2021) (va) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 213 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-01-31 | 214 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (250 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 213 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties are directed to provide another status update by February 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/31/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-02-28 | 215 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) and proposal for further status report by March 21, 2022 Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2022) |
2022-03-01 | 216 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (252 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties are to provide a further status update by March 21, 2022. The parties are directed to include in that status update the amount of time that they believe necessary to resolve with finality any outstanding disputes about withholdings. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/1/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 03/01/2022) |
2022-03-21 | 217 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/21/2022) |
2022-03-22 | 218 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (217 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court thanks the parties for this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/22/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ate) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-04-21 | 219 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/21/2022) |
2022-04-21 | 220 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (256 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 219 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties are to include in their May 19, 2022 status update an estimate of the time needed for these steps to conclude. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/21/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (tg) (Entered: 04/21/2022) |
2022-05-19 | 221 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/19/2022) |
2022-05-23 | 222 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (221 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 258 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/23/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 05/23/2022) |
2022-05-24 | 223 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Amrit Singh re: (12 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Notice of Appearance. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Amrit) (Entered: 05/24/2022) |
2022-05-25 | 224 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (260 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Notice (Other) filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Amrit Singh terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/25/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (va) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-06-21 | 225 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/21/2022) |
2022-06-22 | 226 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (262 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 225 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/22/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-07-19 | 227 | STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 07/19/2022) |
2022-07-20 | 228 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (264 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 227 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update and welcomes this news. The parties are directed to submit a stipulation and proposed order of settlement by August 2, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/20/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (tg) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-08-01 | 229 | PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
2022-08-01 | 230 | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, AND DEPARTMENT OF STATE: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the remaining Defendants (the "Parties"), and their respective counsel, that: 1. All remaining claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. 2. Plaintiff releases and discharges all remaining Defendants from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted or could have asserted-in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. 3. Plaintiff and the remaining Defendants understand and agree that this Stipulation and Order contains the entire agreement between them. No statements, representations, promises, agreements, or negotiations, oral or otherwise, between the Parties or their counsel that are not included herein shall be of any force or effect. 4. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts (including, without limitation, by PDF or facsimile) each of which will be deemed an original and all of which will be taken together and deemed one instrument. SO ORDERED. Department of State, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency and Department of Defense terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |