Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuzzfeed, Inc. v. U.S. Department of the Air Force
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv01337
Date Filed2019-02-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffBuzzfeed, Inc.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning tours of Air Force One that included members of Trump's Mar-a-Lago club. The first FOIA request asked for names of civilians invited on the tour. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and provided 62 pages of records with redactions. BuzzFeed filed an administrative appeal of the denial. BuzzFeed submitted two other FOIA requests for records concerning who was invited and the procedures for allowing tours of Air Force One. The agency acknowledged receipt of those two requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Department of the Air Force
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-121COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Air Force. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16336590)Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Request, # 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit C - Response, # 4 Exhibit D - Appeal, # 5 Exhibit E - Request 2, # 6 Exhibit F - Acknowledgment 2, # 7 Exhibit G - Request 3, # 8 Exhibit H - Acknowledgment 3)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-123RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Comcast Corporation, Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media LLC for Buzzfeed, Inc.. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc..(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-124REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-125NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-13Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-13Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-136ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Air Force. (pc) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-267SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Department of the Air Force served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service as to U.S. Air Force, # 2 Exhibit Service as to U.S. Attorney's Office, # 3 Exhibit Service as to U.S. Attorney General)(Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-018MOTION for Matthew L. Schafer to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Serivce)(Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-019PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. Related Document Number: 8 . (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0410ORDER granting 8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR MATTHEW L. SCHAFER TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR BUZZFEED, INC., it is this 4th day of March 2019, hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/4/2019) (rj) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-1311NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anand Swaminathan on behalf of Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Swaminathan, Anand) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-1412MOTION for Nabiha Syed to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-1413PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Buzzfeed, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) Related Document Number: 12 . (Syed, Nabiha) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-2114ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon consideration of the MOTION FOR NABIHA SYED TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL FOR BUZZFEED, INC., it is this 21st day of March 2019, hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Nabiha Syed terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/21/2019) (rj) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2115NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Kendrick Connolly on behalf of U.S. Department of the Air Force. (Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2116ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of the Air Force.(Connolly, Christopher) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar