Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVRANCEA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00385
Date Filed2019-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffION CATALIN VRANCEA
Case DescriptionIon Catalin Vrancea submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his prosecution. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Vrancea filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-07Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/7/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by ION CATALIN VRANCEA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (zmd) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-072MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ION CATALIN VRANCEA. (zmd) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-283PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/27/19. (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar