Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00411
Date Filed2019-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES
Case DescriptionAsian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning implementation of the agency's new notice to appear policy and statistics related to the issuance of NTAs from 2012 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Advancing Justice-LA to clarify its request, Advancing Justice-LA did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Advancing Justice-LA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5952769) filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 02/18/2019)
2019-02-182REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons USCIS, # 2 Summons Summons USA)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 02/18/2019)
2019-02-19Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-193CIVIL COVER SHEET by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES.(Cohen, David) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE. (zef) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-194REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES.(Cohen, David) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-195SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-196STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 19, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-187MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Lapinig, :Firm- Asia Americans Advancing Justice Los Angeles, :Address- 1145 Wilshire Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - 1-888-349-9695. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6007513. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-188MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John Trang, :Firm- Asia Americans Advancing Justice Los Angeles, :Address- 1145 Wilshire Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - 213--241-0225. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6007525. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-189MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laboni Hoq, :Firm- Asia Americans Advancing Justice Los Angeles, :Address- 1145 Wilshire Blvd, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - 213-977-5211. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6007527. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - LOS ANGELES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , and 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Mr. Lapinig, Mr. Trang and Ms. Hoq may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2019. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE served on 2/25/2019 (Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2212RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/25/2019. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar