Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00413
Date Filed2019-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning maintenance, inspection, and repair reports for the Tomah VA Medical Center located in Tomah, Wisconsin. COA Institute also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 54 pages with redactions under Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 5 (privileges), and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). COA Institute filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but aside from limited updates on the status of its appeal, COA Institute heard nothing further from the agency. COA Institute then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5952910) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Dep't of Veterans Affairs, # 8 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 9 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/04/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 3/4/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar