Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHagger v. United States Department of Veteran's Affairs
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2019cv00577
Date Filed2019-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Lee H Rosenthal
PlaintiffClifton Willaims Hagger, Jr.
Case DescriptionClifton Hagger submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his in-service mental health records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hagger filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Veteran's Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-151COMPLAINT against Unites States Department of Veteran's Affairs filed by Clifton Willaims Hagger, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-212ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: # 1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-213NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JenniferOlsonadi, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Summons Issued as to Secretary of the United States Department of Veteran's Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons and USM-285 form delivered to U.S. Marshal's office for service., filed.(JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-044PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed as to Ryan Patrick, United States Attorney, re: Order for Service, served on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019, filed.(SandraSilva, 7) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar