Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLesic v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2019cv00369
Date Filed2019-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Roger T. Benitez
PlaintiffAna Lesic
Case DescriptionAna Lesic, a Croatian citizen living in Southern California, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning herself and Croatia's extradition request. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and EOUSA invoked unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Lesic filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Criminal Division
DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantUnited States Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-221COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, United States Department of State, United States Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12231901.), filed by Ana Lesic. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A. FOIA request to DOJ, # 3 Exhibit B. DOJ Acknowledgement Letter, # 4 Exhibit C. DOJ Email, # 5 Exhibit D. FOIA request to DOS, # 6 Exhibit E. DOS Acknowledgement Letter, # 7 Exhibit F. FOIA request to EOUSA, # 8 Exhibit G. EOUSA Acknowledgement Letter) The new case number is 3:19-cv-369-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Attix, Cheri)(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-252Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-263AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-124SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Lesic. United States Department of Justice served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit US Atty Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Exhibit Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit Agency--DOJ)(Attix, Cheri) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-125SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Lesic. United States Department of State served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit US Atty Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Exhibit Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit Agency--DOS)(Attix, Cheri) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-126SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Lesic. United States Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit US Atty Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Exhibit Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit Agency--EOUSA)(Attix, Cheri) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar