Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00507
Date Filed2019-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the declassification of DOJ records ordered by President Donald Trump. Judicial Watch also requested communications sent to or from DOJ attorney Bruce Ohr. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that it had separated the requests and made two requests with separate tracking numbers. The second request pertaining to Ohr was sent to the National Security Division, which also acknowledged receipt the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5970487) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/5/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/5/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-125NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar