Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUTT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00504
Date Filed2019-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffBABAR JAVED BUTT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS AT WASHINGTON, D.C. ("EOUSA")
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY ("OIP")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-25Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-251COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS AT WASHINGTON, D.C., OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Through 6) (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-252MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-253PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-254MOTION to Seal Exhibits by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-02-255MOTION to Issue Summons by BABAR JAVED BUTT. (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-136ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $47.59 from Prison Account of BABAR JAVED BUTT and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/12/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-137ORDER granting 4 Motion to seal complaint exhibits; denying 5 Motion to Issue Summons. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/12/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-158NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BABAR JAVED BUTT. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-155. (zmd) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-15Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Clerk's Office shall direct the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service on Defendants. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/18/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar