Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00608
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted two FOIA requests to the U.S. Agency for Global Media for records concerning the broadcast of a video attacking George Soros that was run on Radio and Television Marti, which is run by the Office of Cuba Broadcasting, a component of USGMA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5981498) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-052SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-083ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/08/19. (DM) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA served on 3/6/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Shah, Nitin) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar