Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRominov Investment Services Inc. et al v. Attorney General of the United States et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2019cv00427
Date Filed2019-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gregory A. Presnell
PlaintiffRominov Investment Services Inc.
PlaintiffGustavo Johan Romer Valeri
PlaintiffNina Valentina Ivanoff De Romer
Case DescriptionRominov Investment Services submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning visits by agency agents to the offices of Rominov Investment Services. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Rominov Investment Services filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAttorney General of the United States
DefendantSecretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantDirector, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantAssociate Director, Fraud Detection and National Security Directorate of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-051COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Appendix Exhibit C)(Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) Modified on 3/6/2019 to correct docket text (SJB). Modified on 3/7/2019 (LMM). (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-062NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:19-cv-427-Orl-31TBS. (SJB) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-073SUPPLEMENT (Signature Compliance) re 1 Complaint by Nina Valentina Ivanoff De Romer, Gustavo Johan Romer Valeri, Rominov Investment Services Inc. (Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) Modified on 3/7/2019 (LMM). (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-084RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/8/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-085INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/8/2019. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11FILING FEES paid by All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number ORL081168) (JP) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-136SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, and U.S. Attorney. (LMM) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-217NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nina Valentina Ivanoff De Romer, Gustavo Johan Romer Valeri, Rominov Investment Services Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-218CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Interested persons order by Nina Valentina Ivanoff De Romer, Gustavo Johan Romer Valeri, Rominov Investment Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Inversiones ROMERCA, C.A., Other Affiliate Kleansmart Corporation, Other Affiliate Rominov Management Services for Rominov Investment Services Inc... (Friz-Garcia, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar