Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00622
Date Filed2019-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications pertaining to Russian national Natalia Veselnitskaya, a lawyer who had attended the meeting at Trump Tower concerning potentially harmful information about Hillary Clinton. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Judicial Watch to narrow the scope of the request. Judicial Watch did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5984694) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar