Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5984913) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-08 | 4 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alice C.C. Huling, :Firm- Campaign for Accountability, :Address- 660 Pennsylvania Avenue SE #337 Washington, DC 20003. Phone No. - (202) 780-5750. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5989992. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/08/2019) |
2019-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alice Clare Campbell Huling is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/08/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/08/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/11/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/11/2019 (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of All Defendants (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-05 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 04/05/2019) |
2019-04-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Defendant's Answer or Responsive Pleading shall be due on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/08/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/26/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/08/2019) |
2019-04-26 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 04/26/2019) |
2019-04-29 | 9 | ORDER: Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 13, 2019. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/29/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-04-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/29/2019) |
2019-05-13 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/13/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file their next Joint Status Report, updating the court on the status of production, by June 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/16/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 20, 2019, which updates the court on the status of production. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/24/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/24/2019) |
2019-06-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-08-20 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 08/20/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 21, 2019, that proposes a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/22/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/22/2019) |
2019-10-21 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 10/21/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 20, 2019, that proposes a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/23/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 10/28/2019) |
2019-11-19 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 11/19/2019) |
2019-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 20, 2019, which updates the court on their progress towards settlement. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2019. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-11-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 11/20/2019) |
2019-12-20 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 12/20/2019) |
2019-12-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 20, 2020, which updates the court on their progress towards resolving this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/23/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/23/2019) |
2019-12-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 12/26/2019) |
2020-01-21 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 01/21/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |