Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEW YORK STOCK EXCHANGE LLC v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00640
Date Filed2019-03-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffNEW YORK STOCK EXCHANGE LLC
Case DescriptionThe New York Stock Exchange submitted a FOIA request to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning the participation of Brett Redfearn, Director of the Division of Trading and Markets in the market data proceedings. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Stock Exchange filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-071COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5987153) filed by NEW YORK STOCK EXCHANGE LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons (to: Securities and Exchange Commission), # 5 Summons (to: U.S. Attorney General), # 6 Summons (to: U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia))(Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW YORK STOCK EXCHANGE LLC (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-084NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W. Henkin on behalf of NEW YORK STOCK EXCHANGE LLC (Henkin, Douglas) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/7/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION served on 3/7/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service (SEC))(Henkin, Douglas) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/11/2019. (Carroll, Christina) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar