Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00672
Date Filed2019-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning a 1996 report by the CIA Inspector General pertaining to a drug-running, money-laundering operation involving the airport at Mena, Arkansas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-111COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5992702) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Central Intelligence Agency)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 3/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Rothstein, David) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-155NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-156ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-217Joint STATUS REPORT (1st) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on or before June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/22/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (kt) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-06-198Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Rothstein, David) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-24Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-08-169Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 16, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Additional Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar