Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00688
Date Filed2019-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the agency's FOIA operations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-121COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5995475) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Environmental Protection Agency, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 3/15/2019 (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/18/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/19/2019. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-107GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/10/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-178NOTICE Of Defendant's Intent To Answer by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY re 7 Order,, (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-199ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-22MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 7 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 5/6/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/22/2019.(lckbj1) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-05-0610Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 5/30/2019, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/7/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 6/28/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/3/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-2812Joint STATUS REPORT and PROPOSED SCHEDULE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 9/9/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/5/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar