Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJordan v. District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityColumbia
Case Number3:2019cv00772
Date Filed2019-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr
PlaintiffDiana Jordan
Case DescriptionDiana Jordan filed suit against the District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence after the foundation did not fund her application for roof repairs. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDistrict 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-141COMPLAINT against District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence, filed by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (bgoo) Modified on 3/14/2019 to edit text. (bgoo) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-143MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Diana Jordan. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-188REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge deny Plaintiff's 3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. In the event Plaintiff pays the filing fee, the undersigned recommends the district judge dismiss this case without prejudice to file in an appropriate court and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 4/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/18/2019. (lbak) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-199***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan. (lbak) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-04-0811OBJECTION to 8 Report and Recommendation by Diana Jordan. Reply to Objections due by 4/22/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) (lbak) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar