Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-11 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/11/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS filed by DAVID E. HILL. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Documents to Complaint) (zmd) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID E. HILL (zmd) Modified on 3/18/2019 (zmd). (SOME DOCUMENTS ARE ILLEGIBLE) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-11 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DAVID E. HILL. (zmd) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-22 | 4 | ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. See Order for further details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 3/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Order Denying Motion to Proceed IFP for Civil Case 18-2772) (zmd) (Entered: 03/22/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |