Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23405523 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Immigrant Defenders Law Center(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Public Counsel(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Liubicic added to party Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic(pty:pla))(Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 3 | NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, (Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 4 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 5 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 6 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 7 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 8 | 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (esa) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 9 | 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (esa) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 10 | APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Liubicic, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 11 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Rocio Colon. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 12 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Angela Fiorentino-Rios. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 13 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Sam Hillhouse, Authorized Agent. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-18 | 14 | REFUND OF $400.00 made payable on April 18, 2019 to Robert J. Liubicic for payment made on March 20, 2019 Re: APPLICATION for Refund of Fees Paid Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 10 . (lmh) (Entered: 04/18/2019) |
2019-04-19 | 15 | NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, 11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing formal Title page with required LR 11-3.8 required party, attorney court, case information. Pdf is only set of Green postal return receipts.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 04/19/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 16 | PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk, Office of the United States Attorney. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General of the United States. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-06-12 | 17 | STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 18 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 22, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-12 | 19 | ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO JULY 22, 2019 18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 07/12/2019) |
2019-07-22 | 20 | ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2019) |
2019-07-29 | 21 | Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sameer Ahmed counsel for Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. Sameer Ahmed is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Immigrant Defenders Law Center, et al.. (Ahmed, Sameer) (Entered: 07/29/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 22 | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-05 | 23 | Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jessica Karp Bansal counsel for Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. Adding Jessica Karp Bansal as counsel of record for Immigrant Defenders Law Center, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Immigrant Defenders Law Center, et al.. (Attorney Jessica Karp Bansal added to party Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Karp Bansal added to party Immigrant Defenders Law Center(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Karp Bansal added to party Public Counsel(pty:pla), Attorney Jessica Karp Bansal added to party Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic(pty:pla))(Bansal, Jessica) (Entered: 08/05/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 24 | STIPULATION to Continue Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference from August 19, 2019 to August 26, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only 22 filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alexandra Achamallah added to party Public Counsel(pty:pla))(Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 25 | ORDER CONTINUING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 24 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) in this matter is continued from August 19, 2019 at 11:00 AM to August 26, 2019 at 11:00 AM. (lom) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 26 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 27 | JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 0 days, filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-26 | 28 | MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Cause called; appearances made. Scheduling conference is not held. The Court and counsel confer regarding thepending Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) and the Vaugh Index. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference to October 21, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. at which time the parties should be prepared to update the Court on their search results and production of documents. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc) Modified on 8/30/2019 (lc). (Entered: 08/30/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 29 | STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference Re: Status Conference - optional html form,,, Set/Reset Hearing,, 28 filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-18 | 30 | ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 25, 2019 11:00 AM 29 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 10/18/2019) |
2019-11-25 | 31 | MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates, all other dates are deferred: Last Day to File Motion for Summary Judgment: February 10, 2020 ;Cross Motion Summary Judgment: March 10, 2020; Opposition to Summary Judgment: April 10, 2020; Reply to Summary Judgment: April 24, 2020; Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing: May 11, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc) (Entered: 12/02/2019) |
2020-02-05 | 32 | Joint STIPULATION for Order Continuing Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2020) |
2020-02-05 | 33 | CONTINUING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder 32 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation is granted and the Court continues the deadlines as follows: Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing is set for 6/8/20 at 10:00 am (yl) (Entered: 02/07/2020) |
2020-03-04 | 34 | STIPULATION for Order to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/04/2020) |
2020-03-05 | 35 | ORDER CONTINUING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION 34 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Last Day to File Motion for Summary Judgment: 3/23/20;Cross Motion Summary Judgment: 4/21/20; Opposition to Summary Judgment: 5/22/20; Reply to Summary Judgment: 6/5/20; Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing: 6/22/20 10:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 03/05/2020) |
2020-03-20 | 36 | STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-03-20 | 37 | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION 36 by Judge Christina A. Snyder:Last Day to File Motion for Summary Judgment 4/27/20; Cross Motion Summary Judgment 5/26/20;Opposition to Summary Judgment 6/26/20;;Reply to Summary Judgment 7/10/20Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing 7/27/20 at10:00 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 03/23/2020) |
2020-04-20 | 38 | STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-04-21 | 39 | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION 38 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Last Day to File Motion for Summary Judgment: 5/18/20;Cross Motion Summary Judgment: 6/16/20; Opposition to Summary Judgment: 7/17/20; Reply to Summary Judgment: 7/31/20; Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing: 8/17/20 10:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2020) |
2020-05-13 | 40 | STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2020) |
2020-05-14 | 41 | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION 40 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Last Day to File Motion for Summary Judgment: 6/1/20;Cross Motion Summary Judgment: 6/30/20; Opposition to Summary Judgment: 7/31/20; Reply to Summary Judgment: 8/14/20; Motion for Summary Judgment/Further Scheduling Conference Hearing: 8/31/20 10:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 05/14/2020) |
2020-06-01 | 42 | STIPULATION for Order Vacating Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action and Adopting Proposed Briefing Schedule for Filing a Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2020) |
2020-06-01 | 43 | ORDER VACATING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION AND ADOPTING PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FILING A MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS 42 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiffs will file any Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 7/20/20; Defendants will file any Opposition 8/3/20; Plaintiffs will file any Reply 8/10/20; Hearing on Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 8/24/20 at 10:00 a.m. (lc) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-17 | 44 | STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Attorneys' Fees Motion Deadlines in this FOIA Action filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Achamallah, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/17/2020) |
2020-07-21 | 45 | ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ATTORNEYS FEES MOTION 44 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiffs will file any Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs: 7/27/20; Defendants Opposition: 8/10/20; Plaintiff Reply: 8/17/20; Hearing on Motion for Attorneys'Fees and Costs: 8/31/20 10:00 AM. (lc) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-27 | 46 | NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Bansal, Jessica) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
2020-07-27 | 47 | STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs Esperanza Immigrant Rights Project at Catholic Charities, Immigrant Defenders Law Center, Public Counsel, Western State College of Law Immigration Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bansal, Jessica) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
2020-07-27 | 48 | DISMISSAL ORDER PER STIPULATION OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE 47 by Judge Christina A. Snyder, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 07/27/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |