Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00774
Date Filed2019-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of State, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning communications with presidential advisor Stephen Miller or his former assistant McLaurine Kingler. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Administration for Children and Families told AO that it could not open its email attachment. AO resubmitted the request. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told AO that it had no records. AO filed an administrative appeal of the no records decision. ICE then told AO that it was able to conduct a search for Miller's communications. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-201COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6011657) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons for USAO, # 14 Summons for AG, # 15 Summons for DOJ, # 16 Summons for State, # 17 Summons for HHS, # 18 Summons for ACF, # 19 Summons for DHS, # 20 Summons for ICE, # 21 Summons for USCIS, # 22 Summons for CBP)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-213SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-25NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT did not have Court seal. Summons to US IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT will be re-issued for 03/25/2019 with Court seal. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-254SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-265MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6022966. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-27MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Katherine Marie Anthony is admitted to represent Plaintiff American Oversight pro hac vice in this case. The Court notes, however, that once Ms. Anthony is admitted to the District of Columbia Bar, she must promptly apply for admission to this Court's bar, and she may no longer assume that her motions for leave to appear pro hac vice before this Court will be granted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 27, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-026NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/29/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/1/2019; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 3/29/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Clay M. Goode)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-198Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar