Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00807
Date Filed2019-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning a meeting between staff from the Intelligence Community Inspector General and former FBI deputy assistant director Peter Stzrok regarding security threats posed by Hillary Clinton's use of a private email server. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-221COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6017170) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Office of the Director of National Intelligence)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-294STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/29/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-05-016ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-06-25MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than August 5, 2019. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/25/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 8/5/2019. (mac) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-08-057Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-268Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-09-03MINUTE ORDER. In light of 8 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/3/2019. (lcegs2) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar