Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6024859) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-03-27 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/27/2019) |
2019-04-02 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/1/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/1/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/02/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-01 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 05/01/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before May 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/2/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/16/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/02/2019) |
2019-05-16 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: upon consideration of the parties' 7 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report setting forth a processing schedule on or before July 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/17/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/10/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019) |
2019-07-10 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2019) |
2019-07-16 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2019) |
2019-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant will make an initial release of records on or before October 15, 2019, with a status report to follow no later than November 1, 2019 to update the Court and Plaintiff on the progress of consultations. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in that status report, Defendant shall commit to processing a specific number of documents per month. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant will make its next release on January 15, 2020, with rolling productions to follow on the 15th of every other month thereafter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/17/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-10-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (tj) (Entered: 10/23/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2020-01-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 10 the Defendant's Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/29/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/29/2020) |
2020-02-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/13/2020. (tj) (Entered: 02/04/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' most recent joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before April 17, 2020, and every 60 days thereafter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/11/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/11/2020) |
2020-03-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/17/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/17/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-04-17 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-06-17 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/17/2020) |
2020-08-17 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 08/17/2020) |
2020-10-21 | 15 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John DeMott on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2020) |
2020-10-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (DeMott, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2020) |
2020-12-21 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2021-02-22 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2021) |
2021-04-26 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2021) |
2021-06-24 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2021) |
2021-07-16 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2021) |
2021-07-20 | 22 | STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 07/20/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |