Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6028395) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Declaration corporate disclosure, # 3 Summons Navy Summons, # 4 Summons AG Summons, # 5 Summons USAODC Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/28/2019) |
2019-03-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | | Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-03-29 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 4 | GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-16 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-20 | | MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 5/29/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/20/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/20/2019) |
2019-05-24 | 7 | NOTICE Regarding Intent to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/24/2019) |
2019-05-29 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2019) |
2019-05-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 4 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/30/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/30/2019) |
2019-06-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/13/2019) |
2019-06-25 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/23/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/25/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/25/2019) |
2019-08-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 08/23/2019) |
2019-08-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 11/22/2019, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/27/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/27/2019) |
2019-11-22 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 11/22/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/17/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/5/2019. (jag) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2020-01-17 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 2/18/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/27/2020. (jag) (Entered: 01/27/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER. Where only attorneys' fees remain at issue in a FOIA case, it is the practice of this Court to close the case administratively while it awaits notice from the parties regarding settlement of the attorneys' fees or a joint proposed schedule for briefing this remaining dispute. It appears, from the representations made in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, that the only remaining matters in dispute in this case may be attorneys' fees and costs. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/19/2020, Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be administratively closed in accordance with the Court's practice, while the Court awaits notice regarding settlement or a briefing schedule for any dispute related to attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/24/2020. (jag) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 3/19/2020. (zjch) (Entered: 02/25/2020) |
2020-04-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Where only attorneys' fees remain at issue in a FOIA case, it is the practice of this Court to close the case administratively while it awaits notice from the parties regarding settlement of the attorneys' fees or a joint proposed schedule for briefing this remaining dispute. Accordingly, in light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 6/1/2020, which shall contain a proposed schedule for briefing the issue of attorneys' fees, if such briefing is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/17/2020. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-06-01 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/01/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |