Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBURNETT v. DOJ/DEA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00870
Date Filed2019-03-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffGERRY D. BURNETT
Case DescriptionGerry Burnett, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning the basis for a search warrant used for surveillance of Burnett during the agency's investigation of him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Burnett that his request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Burnett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDOJ/DEA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-271COMPLAINT against DOJ/DEA ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616097333) filed by GERRY D. BURNETT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-27SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DOJ/DEA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-06-182MOTION to Compel by GERRY D. BURNETT. "Let this be filed. The Motion is Denied for failure to comply with local rules" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/18/2019 (jf) . (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-24Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-253MOTION for Extension of Time by GERRY D. BURNETT (jf) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-254MOTION to Appoint Counsel by GERRY D. BURNETT. "Let this be filed" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 07/25/2019 (jf) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-255MOTION for Reconsideration by GERRY D. BURNETT. "Let this be filed as a Motion to Reconsider Plaintiff's Motion to Compel" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 07/25/2019 (jf) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-07-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that the deadline to serve the government defendants pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(c) and 4(i) is extended to October 29, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall reissue the summonses to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 31, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Deadline To Serve The Governments Defendants due by 10/29/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel, the Court does not find appointment of civil counsel under Local Rule 83.11(b)(3) appropriate at this time. Plaintiff's Motion is therefore DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 1, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Reconsider Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 1, 2019. (lccjn1) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-02SUMMONS REISSUED (4) as to DOJ/DEA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zeg) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar