Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00901
Date Filed2019-03-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted three FOIA requests to the National Institute for Health for records. Two of the requests concerned contacts between the agency and alcoholic beverage manufacturers. The third request concerned funding of grants made possible by contributions from for-profit companies. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver for all three requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-03-291COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6029904) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Rule 26.1 Certificate)(Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-05-024NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-025Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's Consent 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond on or before June 3, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/2/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/3/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-316Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED; (2) Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond on or before June 19, 2019; (3) The parties shall file a joint status report by that date. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/3/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/19/2019. Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-197ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-198Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report by July 23, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/20/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-239Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Rosenbaum, Adina) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-23MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report by September 23, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar