Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHartnett v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2019cv02350
Date Filed2019-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Edmond E. Chang
PlaintiffDaniel T Hartnett
Case DescriptionDaniel Hartnett submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the responsibilities of a Fraud Technical Advisor. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Hartnett tried to check the status of his request several times, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hartnett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-081COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATIVE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Daniel T Hartnett; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15684287. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-082CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-083ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett by Daniel T. Hartnett (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-084ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett by Maureen J Moody (Moody, Maureen) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-08CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-085NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-086MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 06/06/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-09SUMMONS Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (lw, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-157AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding Summons and Complaint served on William P. Barr, Attorney General of the U.S. on 04/09/2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-158AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding summons and complaint served on Internal Revenue Service on April 9, 2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-159AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding summons and complaint served on A. Amparano on April 9, 2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1510AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding summons and complaint served on P. Sharisse Tompkins on April 9, 2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1511AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding summons and complaint served on John R. Lausch, Jr., Esq. on April 9, 2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-2212AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding Summons & Complaint served on William P. Barr, Attorney General of the U.S. on 4/16/2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2213AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding Affidavit of Service served on Internal Revenue Service on 4/16/2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2214AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding Affidavit of Service served on P. Sharisse Tompkins, IRS on 4/16/2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2215AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett regarding Affidavit of Service served on A. Amparano, IRS on 4/16/2019 (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2616MOTION by Plaintiff Daniel T Hartnett Motion to Re-Schedule the Initial Status Hearing (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2617NOTICE of Motion by Daniel T. Hartnett for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 16 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/1/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Hartnett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2618DESIGNATION of Douglas G. Snodgrass as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Internal Revenue Service (Snodgrass, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-3019MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's counsel emailed the courtroom deputy, with a copy to the government, to report that the government has no objection to the motion 16 to reset the status hearing. The motion is granted but the first available date after 05/09/2019 is 05/20/2019. The status hearing of 6/06/2019 is accelerated to 05/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The joint initial status report is due by 05/15/2019. Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-1520STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Daniel T Hartnett (Moody, Maureen) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-1521ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Internal Revenue Service by Joseph Edward Hunsader (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar