Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Colorado v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv01036
Date Filed2019-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Colorado
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Colorado submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the death of Kamyar Samimi, a permanent legal resident who had been detained by ICE and died in custody. The ACLU of Colorado also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and eventually provided five pages with redactions. The ACLU of Colorado filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency responded to the appeal by telling the ACLU of Colorado that its request was being remanded for further searching but that the circumstances surrounding Samini's death were still under investigation, limiting the agency's ability to search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Colorado filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-091COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6624945)Attorney Arash Jahanian added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado(pty:pla), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Jahanian, Arash) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-092Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-093SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-094Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-095NOTICE of Related Case by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado (Jahanian, Arash) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-096MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01036-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-097Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-108ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/10/2019. (slibi, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-109CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01036-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1010Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (slibi, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1011NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Mark Silverstein by Mark Silverstein on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of ColoradoAttorney Mark Silverstein added to party American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1812MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/18/19. Consent Form due by 5/23/2019. Status Conference set for 6/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-3013NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs EnforcementAttorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-1614AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint and Summons upon U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement on April 18, 2019 - answer due May 20, 2019 in accordance with 5 USC 552 (a)(4)(C), filed by Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union of Colorado (Jahanian, Arash) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-1615Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bobet, Jane) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar