Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00983
Date Filed2019-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Council submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning a dataset of information about all Form I-129 Petition for Nonimmigrant Worker filed from 2008 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed it on the agency's simple request track. AIC submitted a second FOIA request for the same kinds of records except for I-140 Forms. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-091COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6048706) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-093ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Incorrect Plaintiff on summonses.....Modified on 4/15/2019 (zsb). (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-114NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Valenzuela on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-155SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/22/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 4/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-097NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar