Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00984
Date Filed2019-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Case DescriptionPublic Advocates for the United States submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice and the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning a memo issued by former Attorney General Jeff Sessions requiring designation of a religious liberty point of contact in each U.S. Attorney's Office. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from EOUSA, Public Advocates filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP acknowledged receipt of the appeal but ultimately told Public Advocates that it was closing the appeal because EOUSA had not yet taken any adverse action. Public Advocates then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6048790) filed by PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to AG, # 4 Summons to Justice Department, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-10Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-234ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/23/2019. (DM) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-305NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-166ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar