Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSocolov v. U.S. Department of Justice et. al.
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityAustin
Case Number1:2019cv00419
Date Filed2019-04-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lee Yeakel
PlaintiffEmily Socolov
Case DescriptionEmily Socolov, an historian and folklorist at the University of Texas, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the conviction of her mother, Judith Coplon during the Cold War on charges of spying for the Soviet Union. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency withheld a number of records under Exemption 1 (national security), Exemption 3 (other statutes), and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Socolov filed administrative appeals of the withholdings, but ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantOffice of Legal Counsel
DefendantOffice of Information Policy
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
Complaint attachment 40
Complaint attachment 41
Complaint attachment 42
Complaint attachment 43
Complaint attachment 44
Complaint attachment 45
Complaint attachment 46
Complaint attachment 47
Complaint attachment 48
Complaint attachment 49
Complaint attachment 50
Complaint attachment 51
Complaint attachment 52
Complaint attachment 53
Complaint attachment 54
Complaint attachment 55
Complaint attachment 56
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-04-151COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12001623), filed by Emily Socolov. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9A, # 11 Exhibit 9B, # 12 Exhibit 10A, # 13 Exhibit 10B, # 14 Exhibit 11A, # 15 Exhibit 11B, # 16 Exhibit 12A, # 17 Exhibit 12B, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14A, # 20 Exhibit 14B, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16A, # 23 Exhibit 16B, # 24 Exhibit 16C, # 25 Exhibit 17A, # 26 Exhibit 17B, # 27 Exhibit 18, # 28 Exhibit 19, # 29 Exhibit 20A, # 30 Exhibit 20B, # 31 Exhibit 21A, # 32 Exhibit 21B, # 33 Exhibit 22A, # 34 Exhibit 22B, # 35 Exhibit 22C, # 36 Exhibit 23, # 37 Exhibit 24A, # 38 Exhibit 24B, # 39 Exhibit 25, # 40 Exhibit 26, # 41 Exhibit 27, # 42 Exhibit 28, # 43 Exhibit 29, # 44 Exhibit 30, # 45 Exhibit 31, # 46 Exhibit 32A, # 47 Exhibit 32B, # 48 Exhibit 33, # 49 Exhibit 34, # 50 Exhibit 35, # 51 Exhibit 36, # 52 Exhibit 37, # 53 Exhibit 38, # 54 Exhibit 39, # 55 Exhibit 40, # 56 Exhibit 41)(Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-152REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-153Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Information Policy, Office of Legal Counsel, U.S. Department of Justice. (dl) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-154Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Jake Rutherford, Irwin H. Warren, Alexandria E. Swette and Thomas G. James regarding non-admitted status. (dl) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-155Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Norman Siegel and Kate Fletcher. (dl) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-166MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Jake Rutherford ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009403) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-167MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Irwin H. Warren ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009437) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-168MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Alexandria E. Swette ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009452) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-169MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Kate Fletcher ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009464) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1610MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Thomas G. James ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009478) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1611MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Ray Guy for Norman H. Siegel ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12009501) by on behalf of Emily Socolov. (Guy, T.) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-1712ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion for Jake Rutherford to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1713ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Irwin H. Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1714ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Alexandria E. Swette to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1715ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion for Kate Fletcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1716ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Thomas G. James to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-1717ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion for Norman H. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Emily Socolov. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-05-1418SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Socolov. All Defendants served on 4/22/19. Answers due 5/22/19. Modified on 5/14/2019 (lt). (Entered: 05/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar